IL HB3070 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. With respect to establishing certain types of service credit in the Fund, provides that application and payment must be received by the Board while the applicant is an active participant, except that one payment will be permitted after termination of participation. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-IMRF-PURCHASED CREDITS
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] |
Sen. James Clayborne [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0148 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-025-002 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-004-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 7-139 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-139.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-142.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-145.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |