IL HB3067 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2022, a store may not sell or distribute in this State a disposable food service container that is composed in whole or in part of polystyrene foam. Directs the Environmental Protection Agency to adopt rules to implement the amendatory Act's provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-POLYSTYRENE FOAM BAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2022-03-04HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2022-03-02HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2022-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2022-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2022-02-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 016-009-000
2022-02-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Energy & Environment Committee; by Voice Vote
2022-02-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
2022-02-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2022-02-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2022-01-25HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2021-12-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-12-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-12-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-11-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-09-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2021-08-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-08-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-08-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-08-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-08-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-08-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-08-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-08-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2021-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-07-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-07-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2021-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415552.10New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback