IL HB3066 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Freedom to Work Act. Provides that a covenant not to compete shall not be valid or enforceable unless the employee's actual or expected annualized rate of earnings exceeds $75,000 per year on the effective date of the amendatory Act, $80,000 per year beginning on January 1, 2027, $85,000 per year beginning on January 1, 2032, or $90,000 per year beginning on January 1, 2037 (rather than no employer shall enter into a covenant not to compete with any low-wage employee of the employer). Provides that a covenant not to solicit shall not be valid or enforceable unless the employee's actual or expected annualized rate of earnings exceeds $45,000 per year. Provides that a covenant not to compete is void and illegal for any employee who an employer terminates or furloughs as the result of business circumstances or governmental orders related to the COVID-19 pandemic, or under circumstances that are similar to the COVID-19 pandemic, unless enforcement of the covenant not to compete includes compensation equivalent to the employee's base salary at the time of termination for the period of enforcement minus compensation earned through subsequent employment during the period of enforcement. Contains provisions concerning the enforceability of a covenant not to compete or a covenant not to solicit; notice requirements for employers under a covenant not to compete or a covenant not to solicit; remedies for employees who prevail against an employer's civil action to enforce a covenant not to compete or a covenant not to solicit; and certain factors a court may consider when determining whether to reform a covenant not to compete or a covenant not to solicit. Defines "adequate consideration"; "covenant not to compete"; "covenant not to solicit"; "earnings"; and "employee". Removes the definition for the term "low-wage employee".
Title
NON-COMPETE HIGHER THRESHOLD
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Wage Policy & Study Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 90 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 90 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 90 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 90 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 90 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 90 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 90 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3066&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3066.htm |