IL HB3065 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall require health care facilities and health care professionals to conform to specified requirements regarding patient care during a public health emergency. Requires the Department to adopt rules necessary to effectuate the provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
IDPH-PUBLIC HEALTH EMERGENCIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2310 | 2310-50.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |