IL HB3064 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Small Business Truth in Lending Act. Sets forth provisions concerning disclosure requirements for sales-based financing, closed-end commercial financing, open-end commercial financing, factoring transactions, renewal financing, and other forms of financing. Provides that all commercial financing shall include a clear and conspicuous notice on how to file a complaint with the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Provides that the Department may adopt rules. Provides that upon a finding by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation that a provider has violated the provisions or rules, the provider shall be ordered to pay the Department a civil penalty for each violation of the provisions or any rule not to exceed $10,000 for each violation, or if a violation is willful, $20,000 for each violation. Sets forth provisions concerning cease and desist orders, injunctions, investigation and examination, civil actions, violations, and registration. Provides that a violation of the provisions constitutes an unlawful practice in violation of the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Defines terms. Makes a conforming change in the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Effective immediately.
Title
BUSINESS TRUTH IN LENDING ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Hoan Huynh [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Lilian Jimenez [D] | Rep. Kevin Olickal [D] |
Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-10-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3064&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3064.htm |