IL HB3063 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0035
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Makes changes to provisions concerning farmers' markets. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall work with the Farmers' Market Task Force to address farmers' market vendor complaints regarding the reasonableness of local health departments' fees and sanitation provisions. Provides that farmers' market vendors shall provide effective means to maintain potentially hazardous food at a specified temperature. Provides that handwashing stations may be shared by farmers' market vendors. Makes changes to provisions concerning cottage food operations. Changes references from "cottage food operation" to "producer". Makes changes to provisions concerning the regulation of producers. Add provisions concerning the kinds of transactions exempt from specified regulation. Removes provisions concerning potentially hazardous foods. Removes an exemption from provisions concerning the regulation of producers that applies when the gross receipts from the sale of food do not exceed $36,000 in a calendar year. Provides that no later than December 31, 2017, the Department shall include in the Department's cottage food operation application form a statement containing specified content. Makes changes to definitions. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FARMERS MARKETS-COTTAGE FOOD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0035
2017-08-04HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-04HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-09HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-12HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; 015-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106253.3Amended CodeCitation Text
4106254Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback