IL HB3062 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Wrongful Discharge from Employment Act. Requires an employer to furnish to a discharged employee a statement of reasons for the discharge. Prohibits an employer from preventing or attempting to prevent a discharged employee from obtaining other employment. Prohibits blacklisting. Provides that a discharge is wrongful if the discharge was a constructive discharge, if it was not for good cause, or if the discharge was in violation of the employer's personnel policy. Establishes remedies. Defines terms. Provides that an employer who violates the Act commits a Class A misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE EMPLOYMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback