IL HB3061 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires the Illinois Investment Policy Board to make its best efforts to identify all companies that contract to build a border wall and include those companies in the list of restricted companies distributed to each retirement system and the Illinois State Board of Investment. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-PROHIBITED TRANSACTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity Committee; 007-004-000
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-110.16Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback