IL HB3059 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a school district's school report card to include average daily attendance by grade level. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-AVERAG DAILY ATTENDANCE
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0147 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-001-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |