IL HB3057 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act. Provides that retailers that have more than $100,000 in gross sales to Illinois purchasers in the previous year and do not collect the tax under the Act must do the following: (1) provide a notice to each Illinois purchaser that the tax under the Act is due on purchases that are not tax exempt and that the State requires the Illinois purchaser to file a return under the Act; (2) provide a notice to each Illinois purchaser who purchases more than $500 worth of goods in a year containing specific information about purchases that may result in Illinois use tax liability; and (3) file an annual report with the Department of Revenue showing the total amount paid for purchases by those Illinois purchasers during the preceding calendar year. Sets forth penalties for failure to submit those notices and reports. Provides that the term "Illinois purchaser" means a purchaser (i) with a billing address in this State or (ii) who makes a purchase for delivery to an address in this State. Effective immediately.
Title
USE TAX-RETAILER DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2017-03-30 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-09 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3057&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3057.htm |