IL HB3056 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Employee Background Fairness Act. Provides that an employer may not refuse to hire an individual and may not discharge an individual because of the individual's criminal history unless the individual has one or more convictions and there is a direct relationship between one of more of an individual's convictions and the specific employment sought. Prohibits retaliation for exercising rights under the Act. Provides that an individual denied or discharged from employment because of his or her criminal history in violation of the Act may recover from the employer in a civil action: (1) damages in the amount of $2,000 or actual damages, whichever is greater; (2) costs and reasonable attorney's fees as allowed by the court; and (3) any other appropriate relief, including punitive damages. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
EMPLOYEE BACKGROUND FAIRNESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-27 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3056&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3056.htm |