IL HB3056 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that within one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Pollution Control Board shall adopt amendments to the rules adopted under specified provisions to require groundwater monitoring at all clean construction or demolition debris fill operations and all uncontaminated soil fill operations. Provides that the groundwater monitoring requirements adopted pursuant to specified provisions shall be designed to detect and prevent exceedances of the Board's Class I groundwater quality standards. Provides that the amended rules may also provide exceptions or exclusions from groundwater monitoring during active dewatering at a clean construction or demolition debris fill operation or uncontaminated soil fill operation. Effective immediately.
Title
CONSTRUCTION-DEMOLITION DEBRIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-09 | House | To Environmental Regulations Subcommittee |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 22.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 22.51a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3056&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3056.htm |