IL HB3055 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipality may not use points systems, quotas, or any related process that tracks or accounts for the number of citations or warnings issued by a police officer. Provides that the number of traffic stops completed and written warnings are not included (currently, are included) in the definition of "points of contact". Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CODE-POLICE QUOTAS/POINTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-1-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3055&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3055.htm |