IL HB3054 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0034
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Circuit Courts Act. Provides that every circuit court judge shall announce that a person can file a complaint against him or her, prior to calling the first case of the day, and that a person can pick up a form with instructions on filing a complaint from the clerk. Provides that the clerk of the circuit court shall make available instructions for the filing of a complaint against a judge with the Judicial Inquiry Board. Provides that the clerk shall post within each courtroom a notice that a person may file a complaint against the judge and that instructions for filing a complaint may be obtained from the clerk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIRCUIT COURTS-COMPLAINTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0034
2017-08-04HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-04HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-09HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-12HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-20SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2017-02-24HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7053528.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback