IL HB3050 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Infant Born Alive Protection Act. Provides that any physician who intentionally performs an abortion when there is a reasonable likelihood or possibility of sustained survival of the fetus outside the womb shall utilize the method most likely to preserve the life and health of the fetus, and that failure to do so is a Class 3 felony. Prohibits the performance or inducement of an abortion when the fetus is viable unless there is in attendance a physician other than the physician performing or inducing the abortion who shall take control of and provide immediate medical care for any child born alive as a result of the abortion. Provides that any living individual organism of the species homo sapiens who has been born alive is legally an individual under the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a Class 3 felony is committed when a physician under specified circumstances intentionally, knowingly, or recklessly fails to exercise the same conduct to preserve the life and health of a child as would be required for a child born alive at the same gestational age. Provides that nothing in the Act requires a physician to employ a method of abortion which, in the medical judgment of the physician, would increase medical risk to the mother. Except in specified circumstances, requires specified persons to inform a woman upon whom an abortion is to be performed when an anesthetic or analgesic is available for use to abolish or alleviate organic pain caused to the fetus by the particular method of abortion to be employed and provides that failure to do so is a Class B misdemeanor. Contains other provisions.
Title
INFANT BORN ALIVE PROTECTION
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-12-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3050&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3050.htm |