IL HB3048 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Low-Level Radioactive Waste Management Act. Abolishes the Low-Level Radioactive Waste Task Group and makes corresponding changes including removing provisions concerning the adoption of criteria for selection of a site for a regional disposal facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RADIOACTIVE WASTE TASK GROUP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0146
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 019-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4202010.2Amended CodeCitation Text
4202010.3Amended CodeCitation Text
4202012.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4202014Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback