IL HB3044 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Requires the Department of Labor to publish, by July 15 of each year on its official website, a prevailing wage schedule for each county in the State based upon the prevailing rate of wages investigated and ascertained by the Department during the month of June.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PREVAIL-WAGE COUNTY SCHEDULES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2017
2017-05-05SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-000-000
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-04-12HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-12HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2017-04-10HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-05HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2017-04-05HousePension Note Filed
2017-04-05HouseJudicial Note Filed
2017-04-04HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2017-04-03HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-03HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000
2017-03-01HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201309Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback