IL HB3043 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Reproductive Health Act. Creates the Illinois Abortion Law of 2021 containing the provisions of the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975 before its repeal by Public Act 101-13, as well as provisions: defining "viability" and "fetal heartbeat" and restricting the performance of an abortion to a patient who resides in the State. Creates the Partial-birth Abortion Ban Act of 2021 and the Abortion Performance Refusal Act of 2021 containing the provisions of the Partial-birth Abortion Ban Act and the Abortion Performance Refusal Act before their repeal by Public Act 101-13. Amends various Acts by restoring the language that existed before the amendment of those Acts by Public Act 101-13. Effective immediately.
Title
REPEAL REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3043&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3043.htm |