IL HB3043 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0466
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0466
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of historic site vandalism. Provides that a person commits historic site vandalism when he or she knowingly inflicts damage to property located in or on a historic site. Defines "historic site" as (1) property listed on the National Register of Historic Places; or (2) property designated with landmark status by any county, township, or municipality. Provides that a violation is a petty offense. Provides that in addition to any other sentence imposed, the court shall sentence the offender to pay: (1) financial restitution for replication and repair of damage to the property vandalized that meets the quality of the original construction of the structure or grounds; and (2) a fine equal to the cost of replication of the vandalized property. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-VANDALIZE HISTORIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0466 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2013 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2013-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David Harris |
2013-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2013-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |