IL HB3042 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to allow the Governor to prohibit or restrict a religious group from conducting a religious service or a resident of the State from attending such services in person.
Title
IEMA-RELIGIOUS SERVICES
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Tom Weber [R] |
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-09-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-09-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-08-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3305 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3042&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3042.htm |