IL HB3041 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the aggregate appropriations available for the State portion of salaries for State's Attorneys, those Assistant State's Attorneys who receive funding for a portion of their salary from the State, county supervisors of assessments, and public defenders from all State funds for each State fiscal year shall be no less than the total aggregate appropriations made available for the State portion of salaries for State's Attorneys, those Assistant State's Attorneys who receive funding for a portion of their salary from the State, county supervisors of assessments, and public defenders for the immediately preceding fiscal year. Provides that if for any reason the aggregate appropriations made available are insufficient to meet the required levels, the provisions shall constitute a continuing appropriation of all amounts necessary for these purposes. Allows the General Assembly to appropriate lesser amounts by law. Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the portion of the salary for the county supervisor of assessments that is paid by the State is subject to the State Budget Law (rather than subject to appropriation). Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the portion of the salary for State's Attorneys, certain Assistant State's Attorneys, and public defenders that is paid by the State is subject to the State Budget Law (rather than subject to appropriation). Amends the State Revenue Sharing Act to make changes concerning the Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATES ATTY-CONTINUING APPROP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152050-40New CodeSee Bill Text
3011512Amended CodeCitation Text
352003-20Amended CodeCitation Text
352003-40Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-4007Amended CodeCitation Text
5554-2001Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback