IL HB3038 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that an electric utility with more than 100,000 customers shall not purchase any receivable priced at a higher price than is obtained for consumers through the power procurement process provided under specified provisions of the Act. Provides that only those amounts equal to and less than the price obtained for consumers in the Illinois Power Agency procurement process shall be purchased by an electric utility with more than 100,000 customers and that any costs to the utility associated with this requirement shall be recovered from participating alternative retail electric suppliers. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITY-UNCOLLECT RECEIVABLES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-13 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-03-07 | House | To Special Matters Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 16-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3038&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3038.htm |