IL HB3034 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that the referral of an objection from a law enforcement agency for the issuance of a concealed carry license to the Concealed Carry Licensing Review Board shall toll the 90-day period for not more than 60 days for the Department of State Police to issue or deny the applicant a license. Provides that if an objection of a law enforcement agency or the Department is not supported by clear and convincing evidence, the Board shall dismiss the objection and notify the Department that the applicant is eligible for a license. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY-OBJECTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306615Amended CodeCitation Text
4306620Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback