IL HB3032 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Revenue Estimate Act. Provides that the General Assembly shall not enact any bill to appropriate funds within any fiscal year prior to its adoption of a joint resolution reflecting the estimate of funds available for that fiscal year as required under the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability Act. Effective immediately.
Title
NO FUNDS W/OUT REVENUE EST
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D] |
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. David Welter [R] | Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-09-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3032&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3032.htm |