IL HB3032 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Interagency Military Base Support and Economic Development Committee.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0144 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Re-assigned to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |