IL HB3027 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the Secretary of State to provide a disabilities motor decal or device to an expectant mother during her third trimester. Provides that a decal or device provided to an expectant mother shall be valid for no more than 90 days, and shall clearly set forth the date that the decal or device expires. Provides that a decal or device shall be issued only upon a showing by adequate documentation that the expectant mother has entered her third trimester.
Title
VEH CD-SPECIAL PARKING DECALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0453 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 019-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-14 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1301.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |