IL HB3025 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall reimburse epilepsy specialists, as defined by the Department by rule, who are authorized by Illinois law to provide epilepsy treatment services to persons with epilepsy or related disorders via telehealth. Provides that the Department shall establish, by rule, a method to reimburse providers for epilepsy treatment services provided by telehealth. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-TELEHEALTH-EPILEPSY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0207 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date July 30, 2021 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-001-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 024-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |