IL HB3024 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the County Jail Act. Provides that upon the release of a prisoner or detainee from the County Department of Corrections or county jail, the County Department or sheriff shall provide the person who has met the criteria established by the Department or sheriff with an identification card identifying the person as being released from the County Department of Corrections or county jail. Provides that the County Department or sheriff, in consultation with the Office of the Secretary of State, shall prescribe the form of the identification card, which may be similar to the form of the standard Illinois Identification Card. Provides that the County Department or sheriff shall inform the prisoner or detainee that he or she may present the identification card to the Office of the Secretary of State upon application for a standard Illinois Identification Card in accordance with the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that the County Department or sheriff shall require the prisoner or detainee to pay a $1 fee for the identification card.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTY JAIL-PRISONER ID

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1533512Amended CodeCitation Text
153354Amended CodeCitation Text
73012526.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback