IL HB3014 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Agriculture shall rename the Ethnic Village exhibit at the Illinois State Fair to the Village of Cultures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGR-VILLAGE OF CULTURES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-07HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0216
2019-08-07HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-07HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20205205-23New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback