IL HB3014 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that beginning on July 1, 2017, it shall be unlawful for any person to knowingly place specified materials into a container intended for collection by a residential hauler for processing at a recycling center. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RECYCLING-UNLAWFUL MATERIALS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-09-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-25HouseArrived in House
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-001
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2017-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-008-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 019-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415552.3-15New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback