IL HB3011 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Grant Accountability and Transparency Act. Provides that grants and grant funds which may be awarded under the Act shall not include funds derived from a motor fuel tax or funds derived from the Motor Fuel Tax Fund.
Title
GRANTS-MOTOR FUEL TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 708 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3011&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3011.htm |