IL HB3011 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the hospital credit applies for tax years ending on or after December 31, 2012 and ending on or before December 31, 2022 (currently, the credit sunsets on December 31, 2017 by operation of the Act's automatic sunset provision). Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-HOSPITAL CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-09 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 223 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3011&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3011.htm |