IL HB3010 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the North Shore Water Reclamation District Act. Provides that, for a trustee vacancy, the president of the water reclamation district board of trustees shall appoint an individual of the same political party of the trustee vacating the position. Adds barium, cadmium, mercury, selenium, and silver to the list of substances that may be toxic to the wastewater treatment processes. Provides that it is unlawful for any person to discharge effluent, gaseous wastes, sewage, industrial wastes, or other wastes into the sewage system and makes conforming changes. Provides that if a person has violated a board of trustees' final order, the trustees may authorize disconnection (currently, plugging) of the sewer or direct the water supplier to terminate service. Allows an owner or owners of non-contiguous territory to enter into an agreement requesting annexation of their non-continuous territory to the water reclamation district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NORTH SHORE WATER RECLAMATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-12HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateDo Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-25SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-034-000
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 014-002-000
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70230528Amended CodeCitation Text
7023053Amended CodeCitation Text
7023057Amended CodeCitation Text
7023057.7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback