IL HB3010 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act, the Criminal Code of 2012, the Cannabis Control Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections. Creates Second Chance Probation. Provides that whenever any person who has not previously been convicted of, or placed on probation or conditional discharge for, any felony offense under the laws of this State, the laws of any other state, or the laws of the United States, including probation under Section 410 of the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, Section 70 of the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act, Section 10 of the Cannabis Control Act, subsection (c) of Section 11-14 of the Criminal Code of 2012, Treatment Alternatives for Criminal Justice Clients (TASC) under Article 40 of the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act, or prior successful completion of the Offender Initiative Program under Section 5-6-3.3 of this Code, and pleads guilty to, or is found guilty of, a probationable felony offense of possession of a controlled substance that is punishable as a Class 4 felony; possession of methamphetamine that is punishable as a Class 4 felony; theft that is punishable as a Class 3 felony based on the value of the property or punishable as a Class 4 felony if the theft was committed in a school or place of worship or if the theft was of governmental property; retail theft that is punishable as a Class 3 felony based on the value of the property; criminal damage to property that is punishable as a Class 4 felony; criminal damage to government supported property that is punishable as a Class 4 felony; deceptive practices; forgery; possession of cannabis which is punishable as a Class 4 felony; or possession or use of another's credit or debit card, the court, with the consent of the defendant, may, without entering a judgment, sentence the defendant to probation. Establishes the terms and conditions of the probation. Provides that upon fulfillment of the terms and conditions of probation, the court shall discharge the person and dismiss the proceedings against the person. Provides that upon violation of a term or condition of probation, the court may enter a judgment on its original finding of guilt and proceed as otherwise provided by law.
Title
CD CORR-2ND CHANCE PROBATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 93 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0164 |
2013-08-05 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 093-023-001 |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tom Cross |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-002-000 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-001-000 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-026-000 |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 646 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-3.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |