IL HB3002 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Payday Loan Reform Act. Limits interest on payday loans to an annual percentage rate of 36%. Effective immediately.
Title
PAYDAY LOAN-INTEREST RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 122 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 122 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |