IL HB3002 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Infectious Disease Testing Act. Provides that an individual shall be required to submit, and informed consent shall not be required, to a test to detect an infectious disease upon the request of a health care provider, employee of a health facility, PHRN, EMR, EMT, EMT-I, A-EMT, paramedic, firefighter, or law enforcement officer who, accidentally or in the line of duty, comes into direct skin or mucous membrane contact with the blood or bodily fluids of the individual that is of a nature that may transmit an infectious disease, as determined by a physician in his or her medical judgment. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INFECTIOUS DISEASE TESTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0270
2017-08-22HouseEffective Date August 22, 2017
2017-08-22HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Public Health; 006-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback