IL HB3001 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Security Deposit Return Act. Provides that the lessor shall deliver specified receipts or the security deposit, as applicable, to the lessee in person or by postmarked mail directed to the last known address of the lessee or another address provided by the lessee. Provides that if the lessee fails to provide the lessor with a mailing address or electronic mail address, the lessor shall not be held liable for any damages or penalties as a result of the lessee's failure to provide an address. Provides that if a lessor is unable to produce specified receipts for repairs or replacements, or copies thereof, then the lessor may produce an itemized list of the costs of repair or replacements, along with any other evidence the lessor has of that cost.
Title
SECURITY DEPOSIT-DISCLOSURES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0269 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-004-002 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-001-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2017-04-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-02-24 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 710 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |