IL HB2998 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Diseased Animals Act. Deletes a provision providing that all rules of the Department of Agriculture, and all amendments or revocations of existing rules, shall be recorded in an appropriate book or books, shall be adequately indexed, shall be kept in the office of the Department, and shall constitute a public record and that the rules shall be printed in pamphlet form and furnished, upon request, to the public free of cost. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISEASED ANIMALS-RULE RECORDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 008-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
510502Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback