IL HB2994 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that, in addition to any other procedure available by law to discontinue a township, upon resolutions of the board of trustees of Capital Township in Sangamon County and the Sangamon County Board, and after referendum approval by the voters of the Township and County: (1) Capital Township in Sangamon County is discontinued; and (2) all the rights, powers, duties, assets, property, liabilities, obligations, and responsibilities of the Township are transferred to Sangamon County, including, but not limited to, the administration of the Capital Township's general assistance program. Provides that Capital Township and Sangamon County shall follow the same procedures that townships and municipalities must follow under Article 29 of the Township Code in order to dissolve the Township and transfer all the rights, powers, duties, assets, property, liabilities, obligations, and responsibilities of the Township to the County. Effective immediately.
Title
TWP CD-COTERMINOUS TWPS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 011-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 010-000-001 |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-03-18 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 29-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 29-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 29-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 29-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 29-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |