IL HB2994 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Provider Funding Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Extends the period of time certain hospital assessments are imposed through State fiscal year 2020. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
MEDICAID-HOSPITAL ASSESSMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Medicaid Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-4.105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 14-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5e.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-12.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2994&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2994.htm |