IL HB2992 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Insurance Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Insurance to conduct a study to better understand the gaps in health insurance coverage for uninsured residents, including the reasons why individuals are uninsured and whether insured individuals are insured through an employer-sponsored plan or through the Illinois health insurance marketplace. Requires the Department to submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly 12 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Amends the Hospital Licensing Act and the University of Illinois Hospital Act. Provides that hospitals licensed under the Act shall provide health insurance coverage to all of their workforce.
Title
HOSPITAL WORKFORCE INSURANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-09 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 012-007-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 330 | 3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1405 | 1405-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2992&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2992.htm |