IL HB2989 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Extends the estimated date of completion of a redevelopment project and the retirement of obligations issued to finance redevelopment project costs for an ordinance adopted on September 3, 2015 by the Village of Fox River Grove to create the Downtown TIF #2 District. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TIF-VILLAGE OF FOX RIVER GROVE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-09HouseTo Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2023-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin McLaughlin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback