IL HB2989 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that when a person commits an offense and the person is under 21, rather than under 18, the court, at the sentencing hearing shall consider specified factors in mitigation in determining the appropriate sentence.
Title
CRIM CD&CORR-FIREARM SENTENCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2021-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-007-000 |
2021-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 10-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-1.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-14.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 18-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 18-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 19-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 33A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 8-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 9-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |