IL HB2989 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall in each institution or facility (rather than establish a pilot program in one or more institutions or facilities of the Department) permit committed persons to remotely visit friends and family members (rather than just family members) through interactive video conferences. Provides that the Department shall (rather than may) enter into agreements with third-party organizations to provide video conference facilities for friends and family members of committed persons. The Department shall (rather than may) determine who is a friend or family member eligible to participate in the program and the conditions in which and times when the video conferences may be conducted. Provides that the Department shall require each institution and facility of the Department to have locked and monitored electronic tablets for committed persons to use for educational purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-VIDEO CONFERENCING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0142
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-09SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-04-25HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-25HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-7-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2989&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2989.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2989eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2989enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0142.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2989ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2989ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2989ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2989ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2989ham005.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2989_04262017_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2989_05252017_018000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback