IL HB2987 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-29 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-29 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Postsecondary and Workforce Readiness Act. In provisions concerning postsecondary and career expectations, provides that, beginning in grade 6, students should be introduced to the importance of developing and applying a work ethic in a variety of contexts; sets forth what this introduction may include.
Title
SCHOOLS-WORK ETHIC INSTRUCTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 148 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |