IL HB2987 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Protection of Individuals with Disabilities in the Criminal Justice System Task Force Act of 2019. Re-establishes the Protection of Individuals with Disabilities in the Criminal Justice System Task Force. Specifies membership and appointment of the Task Force. Provides that the Guardianship and Advocacy Commission shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall consider issues that affect adults and juveniles with disabilities with respect to their involvement with the police, detention and confinement in correctional facilities, representation by counsel, participation in the criminal justice system, communications with their families, awareness and accommodations for their disabilities, and concerns for the safety of the general public and individuals working in the criminal justice system. Provides that the Task Force shall make recommendations to the Governor and to the General Assembly regarding policies, procedures, legislation, and other actions that can be taken to protect the public safety and the well-being and rights of individuals with disabilities in the criminal justice system. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a report with its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the Attorney General, and to the General Assembly on or before September 30, 2020. Repeals Act on January 1, 2022. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISABIL-CRIM JUST-TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0391
2019-08-16HouseEffective Date August 16, 2019
2019-08-16HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 115-000-000
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-22HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-21HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-05-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
2019-05-17HouseArrived in House
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Morrison
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2019-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law
2019-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2987&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2987.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2987eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2987enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0391.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2987ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2987sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2987sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2987sam003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2987_03292019_023000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB2987_05172019_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2987sam003_05302019_050000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback