IL HB2987 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Protection of Individuals with Disabilities in the Criminal Justice System Task Force Act of 2019. Re-establishes the Protection of Individuals with Disabilities in the Criminal Justice System Task Force. Specifies membership and appointment of the Task Force. Provides that the Guardianship and Advocacy Commission shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall consider issues that affect adults and juveniles with disabilities with respect to their involvement with the police, detention and confinement in correctional facilities, representation by counsel, participation in the criminal justice system, communications with their families, awareness and accommodations for their disabilities, and concerns for the safety of the general public and individuals working in the criminal justice system. Provides that the Task Force shall make recommendations to the Governor and to the General Assembly regarding policies, procedures, legislation, and other actions that can be taken to protect the public safety and the well-being and rights of individuals with disabilities in the criminal justice system. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a report with its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the Attorney General, and to the General Assembly on or before September 30, 2020. Repeals Act on January 1, 2022. Effective immediately.
Title
DISABIL-CRIM JUST-TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0391 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3 |
2019-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Morrison |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |