IL HB2984 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Comprehensive Lead Education, Reduction, and Window Replacement Program Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-10HouseArrived in House
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-07SenatePostponed - Public Health
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-11-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-11-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-11-01SenateArrive in Senate
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-10-26HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 104-001-000
2017-10-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-10-26HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-10-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-10-26HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-10-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-13HouseRe-assigned to Human Services Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
410431Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2984&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2984.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2984eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2984enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2984ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2984ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2984ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2984sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2984_10262017_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2984_05102018_016000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2984sam001_05312018_029000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback