IL HB2983 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Youth Homelessness Prevention Subcommittee Act. Requires the Governor's Cabinet on Children and Youth to create the Youth Homelessness Prevention Subcommittee to drive the State's strategic vision for preventing homelessness among youth leaving State systems of care. Sets forth the Subcommittee's duties including: (1) reviewing the discharge planning, services plans, and discharge procedures for youth leaving the custody or guardianship of the Department of Children and Family Services, the Department of Juvenile Justice, the Department of Human Services' Division of Mental Health, and the Department of Corrections to determine whether such discharge planning and procedures ensure housing stability for youth leaving State systems of care; and (2) collecting data on the housing stability of youth for one year after they are released from State custody or guardianship. Provides that the Subcommittee shall include specified members, including: (i) one representative from the Governor's office; (ii) 4 representatives from agencies serving homeless youth; and (iii) 4 youth who have a lived experience with homelessness. Contains provisions concerning a quorum, administrative support, subcommittee meetings, and reporting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

YOUTH HOMELESSNESS PREVENTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 018-000-000
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback