IL HB2982 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Organization Act. Provides that, if the House of Representatives or the Senate adopts an amendment to a bill and if that amendment causes the short description of the bill that is posted on the General Assembly's website to no longer accurately reflect the bill's contents, then the chamber that adopted the amendment shall revise the bill's short description so that it accurately reflects the bill's contents.
Title
GA OPERATIONS-UPDATED ABR
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Martin McLaughlin [R] | Rep. Travis Weaver [R] | Rep. Kevin Schmidt [R] |
Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2023-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2982&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2982.htm |